Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
11.04.1980 | Change - applicant | published on 11.06.1980 [1980/12] |
12.09.1979 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
12.09.1979 | Request for conversion to national application | |
18.04.1979 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |