Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0002380 | Global Dossier | 13.06.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85767577 | 05.12.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE37T | 07.12.1979 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US85767577 | 05.12.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR7808000 | 31.07.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US85767577 | 05.12.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK541778 | 06.06.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US85767577 | 05.12.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4120650 | 17.10.1978 | A | Priority number | Date | US85767577 | 05.12.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA786828 | 28.11.1979 | B | Priority number | Date | US85767577 | 05.12.1977 |