Designated contracting states | BE | | DE | | FR | | GB | | LU | | NL | | SE | | Examination procedure | 19.07.1979 | Request for conversion into a national application, for BE [ N /P ] | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 14.11.1979 | | Event description: | APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN | | Event date: | 14.11.1979 | | Event description: | CONVERSION | | Event date: | 13.06.1979 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | BE DE FR GB LU NL SE | | Event date: | 08.08.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | KAPPLER, FRANK ROBERT | | Event date: | 08.08.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | KILLIAN, ROMA JEAN | | Event date: | 08.08.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | GRAMER, JOHN JOSEPH | | Event date: | 18.04.1979 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 12.09.1979 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE APPLICATION IS DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN | |