EP0002583 - Polyolefins containing multiple olefinic unsaturation and carboxylic acid groups and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | ||
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue Morris Township Morris, New Jersey / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seven, Manfred Karl 55 Mt. View Avenue Long Valley New Jersey 07853 / US | 02 /
Olearczyk, Frances Joseph (deceased), late of 22 Henderson Avenue Kenmore New York 14150 / US | [1982/49] |
Former [1982/34] | 01 /
Seven, Manfred Karl 55 Mt. View Avenue Long Valley New Yersey 07853 / US | ||
02 /
Olearczyk, Frances Joseph (deceased), late of 22 Henderson Avenue Kenmore New York 14150 / US | Representative(s) | Collier, Jeremy Austin Grey, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1982/34] | Application number, filing date | 78300758.6 | 06.12.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770859906 | 12.12.1977 Original published format: US 859906 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002583 | Date: | 27.06.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002583 | Date: | 25.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, C08F210/00 | [1982/34] | CPC: |
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
C08F2800/10 (EP,US);
C08F2800/20 (EP,US);
C08F2810/20 (EP,US);
C08F2810/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F210/02 (EP,US);
C08F8/00, C08F210/06 (US,EP);
C08F8/00, C08F210/08 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/34] | C08F8/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Mehrfach olefinisch ungesättigte, Carbonsäuregruppen enthaltende Polyolefine und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1982/34] | English: | Polyolefins containing multiple olefinic unsaturation and carboxylic acid groups and process for their preparation | French: | Polyoléfines contenant plusieurs insaturations oléfiniques ainsi que des groupes acides carboxyliques et procédé pour leur préparation | [1982/34] |
Former [1982/34] | Polyolefine mit mehreren olefinisch ungesättigten und karboxylsäuren Resten und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | ||
Former [1982/34] | Polyoléfines contenant plusieurs restes oléfiniques et des groupes acides carboxyliques et procédé pour leur préparation | Examination procedure | 31.10.1979 | Examination requested [1980/01] | 09.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2249901 [ ] (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) |