EP0002904 - Dental probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIBOW COMPANY LIMITED 1-2-1 Mukojuku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka / JP | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuhiro, Aoki 1871 Nakagouri-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1981/27] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 78300788.3 | 11.12.1978 | Priority number, date | JP19770169306U | 15.12.1977 Original published format: JP 16930677 U | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0002904 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0002904 | Date: | 11.07.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002904 | Date: | 08.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1979 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/02, A61F13/20 | [1981/27] | CPC: |
A61B10/0233 (EP,US);
A61C5/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Sonde für zahnärtzliche Zwecke | English: | Dental probe | French: | Sonde dentaire | Examination procedure | 22.10.1979 | Examination requested [1980/01] | 05.02.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |