Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0012143


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.09.2016 No opposition filed within time limit
08.04.1982 Change - applicant published on  09.06.1982 [1982/23]
14.01.1982 Change - applicant published on  17.03.1982 [1982/11]
26.09.1981 (Expected) grant published on  25.11.1981 [1981/47]
04.07.1980 Change - classification published on  03.09.1980 [1980/18]
29.04.1980 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.06.1980 [1980/13]
29.04.1980 Request for examination filed published on  25.06.1980 [1980/13]