blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0012143

EP0012143 - Air expansion chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
50725 Köln / DE
For:FR 
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME
344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307
92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR
For:BE 
Ford Motor Company Limited
Eagle Way Brentwood
Essex CM13 3BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1982/23]For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-50725 Köln / DE
For:FR 
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME
344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307
F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR
For:BE 
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED
Eagle Way
Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB
Former [1982/11]For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 210369
D-5000 Köln 21 / DE
For:FR 
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME
344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307
F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR
For:BE 
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED
Eagle Way
Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB
Former [1980/13]For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 210369
D-5000 Köln 21 / DE
For:FR 
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME
344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307
F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR
For:BE 
Ford Motor Company
Dearborn Wayne Michigan / US
Inventor(s)01 / Clifton, Colin Ralph
9 Durrington Close
Basildon Essex / GB
[1980/13]
Representative(s)Drakeford, Robert William, et al
15/448 Research & Engineering Centre
Laindon
Basildon
Essex SS15 6EE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1980/13]Drakeford, Robert William, et al
15/448 Research & Engineering Centre
Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB
Application number, filing date78300862.619.12.1978
[1980/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0012143
Date:25.06.1980
Language:EN
[1980/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0012143
Date:25.11.1981
Language:EN
[1981/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.1979
ClassificationIPC:F02M35/14, F23L1/00
[1980/18]
CPC:
F02M35/0207 (EP); F02M35/02483 (EP); F02M35/1211 (EP);
F02M35/1244 (EP); F02M35/14 (EP)
Former IPC [1980/13]F02M35/14
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR [1980/13]
TitleGerman:Luftexpansionskammer[1980/13]
English:Air expansion chamber[1980/13]
French:Chambre d'expansion d'air[1980/13]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure19.11.1979Examination requested  [1980/13]
09.10.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.1981Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1981Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
21.05.1981Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.1981Fee for grant paid
11.07.1981Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.08.1982No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.1980Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchFR1140679  [ ];
 GB849337  [ ];
 FR1109653  [ ];
 FR1406243  [ ];
 US1930201  [ ];
 GB1060852  [ ];
 DE2702160  [ ];
 US2848065  [ ];
 US4000786  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.