EP0003264 - Method and plant for generating power [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.1979 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1979 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.1980 [1980/01] | 05.11.1979 | Request for conversion to national application | published on 09.01.1980 [1980/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nozawa, Reikichi 2-10-38, Ohokayama Meguroku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Copp, David Christopher, et al Copp & Co. Lloyds Chambers Lloyds Avenue Ipswich Suffolk, IP1 3HE / GB | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78300920.2 | 29.12.1978 | Priority number, date | JP19770159500 | 29.12.1977 Original published format: JP 15950077 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003264 | Date: | 08.08.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F01K25/10, F17C9/02 | CPC: |
F17C9/04 (EP,US);
F01K25/10 (EP,US);
F17C2265/05 (EP,US);
Y02E20/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Krafterzeugung | English: | Method and plant for generating power | French: | Procédé et installation pour la production de force | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 23.08.1979 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.162(4) [1980/01] | 22.09.1979 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/01] | 24.09.1979 | Request for conversion into a national application, for FR/GB/NL [1980/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3266261 [ ] (ANDERSON JAMES H); | DE1922779 [ ] (LINDE AG); | FR1336318 [ ] (CIE GENERALE D ETUDES ELECTRIC); | US3795103 [ ] (ANDERSON J) |