EP0000677 - Parainfluenza virus vaccine and its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | ||
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buynak, Eugene Bernard Gwynedd View Road North Wales Pennsylvania / US | 02 /
Hilleman, Maurice Ralph 4107 Fields Drive Lafayette Hill Pennsylvania / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Corre, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/31] | Corre, Jacques Denis Paul, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 78400058.0 | 12.07.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770817955 | 22.07.1977 Original published format: US 817955 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000677 | Date: | 07.02.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000677 | Date: | 05.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1978 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/08, A61K39/155 | [1981/31] | CPC: |
A61K39/155 (EP);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K2039/5254 (EP);
C12N2760/18634 (EP);
C12N2760/18734 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1981/31] | C12K7/00, A61K39/12, // C12K5/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Parainfluenza-Virus Impfstoff und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | English: | Parainfluenza virus vaccine and its preparation | French: | Vaccin du virus de la parainfluenza et son procédé de préparation | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.03.1979 | Examination requested | 06.09.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 10.07.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.09.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS4940926 [ ] |