EP0012783 - Adjustable display stand for disc-shaped objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.1981 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES VERRERIES INDUSTRIELLES REUNIES DU LOING (SOVIREL) 90-92, Rue Baudin F-92306 Levallois-Perret / FR | [1980/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rouzet, Jacques 2, Rue Faidherbe F-92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [1980/14] | Representative(s) | De Boisse, Louis 37, Avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt F-75008 Paris / FR | [1980/14] | Application number, filing date | 78400268.5 | 29.12.1978 | [1980/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012783 | Date: | 09.07.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | A47F7/00 | [1980/14] | CPC: |
A47F7/0064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LU, NL [1980/14] | Title | German: | Verstellbares Auslagegestell für discusförmige Gegenstände | [1980/14] | English: | Adjustable display stand for disc-shaped objects | [1980/14] | French: | Présentoir réglable pour objets discoides | [1980/14] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 31.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 17.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1980 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE273295 [ ]; | [A]US3282437 |