EP0002168 - Aiding device for rolling spaghetti onto a fork [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zapomel, Janos, Dr. Oetlingerstrasse 5 CH-4057 Basel / CH | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Richard Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Merkurstrasse 25 8400 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/03] | Rottmann, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Rottmann Patentanwälte AG Glattalstrasse 37 P.O. Box A-165 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 78810020.4 | 10.11.1978 | Priority number, date | CH19770014026 | 15.11.1977 Original published format: CH 1402677 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002168 | Date: | 30.05.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002168 | Date: | 20.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1979 | Classification | IPC: | A47G19/00, A47G21/00 | [1982/03] | CPC: |
A47G19/00 (EP,US);
A47J43/28 (EP,US);
A47G2400/067 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/03] | A47G19/00, A47J43/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Hilfsgerät für Essgabel zum Aufwickeln von Spaghetti | English: | Aiding device for rolling spaghetti onto a fork | French: | Appareil auxiliaire pour fourchette servant à enrouler des spaghetti | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.11.1979 | Examination requested [1980/03] | 26.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.10.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.05.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1980 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3611849 [ ] (DOMONKOS JOSEPH); | US2841869 [ ] (HERMAN LEVINE); | FR2161396 [ ] (PARASTATIDIS CHRISTODOUL); | US3589009 [ ] (MISCAVICH WILLIAM J, et al); | US2664722 [ ] (BARR ELIZABETH A); | US2795121 [ ] (PANTELLO JAMES G) |