EP0007333 - RADIATION CONCENTRATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.1980 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.1980 [1980/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUNCH, Jesse, C 815 Thayer Avenue Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US | [1980/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/03] | Application number, filing date | 78900028.8 | 29.06.1978 | [1980/03] | WO1978US00025 | Priority number, date | US19770811963 | 30.06.1977 Original published format: US 811963 | [1980/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO7900018 | Date: | 11.01.1979 | [1979/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007333 | Date: | 06.02.1980 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1979 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/03] | Classification | IPC: | G05D25/00 | [1980/03] | CPC: |
F21S11/00 (EP,US);
F24S23/71 (EP,US);
F24S23/77 (EP,US);
F24S30/45 (EP,US);
G02B7/1827 (EP,US);
Y02E10/40 (US);
Y02E10/47 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1980/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONZENTRATION VON STRAHLUNG | [1980/03] | English: | RADIATION CONCENTRATING SYSTEM | [1980/03] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONCENTRATION DE RADIATIONS | [1980/03] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 26.11.1979 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1980/19] | 26.01.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1976428 (MARIE ARTHUYS JACQUES, et al); | [A]US3466119 (FRANCIA GIOVANNI); | [AP]US4034735 (WALDRIP RALPH L) |