EP0010086 - CONSTRUCTIONAL MEMBER FOR BUILDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsson, Jon Götalandsvägen 194 S-125 55 Älvsjö / SE | [1980/11] |
Former [1980/09] | For all designated states KARLSSON, Jon Götalandsvägen 194 S-125 55 Älvsjö / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/09] | Representative(s) | Bergvall, Sven Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB Sankt Paulsgatan 1 116 47 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/09] | Bergvall, Sven Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB Sankt Paulsgatan 1 S-116 47 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 78900051.0 | 11.07.1978 | [1980/09] | WO1978SE00017 | Priority number, date | SE19770008343 | 19.07.1977 Original published format: SE 7708343 | [1980/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO7900047 | Date: | 08.02.1979 | [1979/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010086 | Date: | 30.04.1980 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1979 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010086 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/21] | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/62, E06B1/12 | [1980/09] | CPC: |
E06B3/08 (EP,US);
E04B2/825 (EP,US);
E06B1/18 (EP,US);
E06B3/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB [1980/09] | Title | German: | BAUELEMENT FÜR GEBÄUDE | [1980/09] | English: | CONSTRUCTIONAL MEMBER FOR BUILDINGS | [1980/09] | French: | ELEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION POUR L'INDUSTRIE DU BATIMENT | [1980/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.1979 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.1979 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.1979 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.1979 | Examination requested [1980/20] | 14.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1980 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.1980 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE969749 (MARIA GROSSMANN GEB VARILEK); | [X]FR2100177 (ERBSLOEH JULIUS & AUGUST [DE]); | [X]FR2107391 (ROYON REGIS); | [X]FR2172307 (GEISLER LIGNIAN ANC ETS ED [BE]); | [X]FR2200428 (STEINMETZ GEORG [DE]); | [X]FR2281482 (AMIAUD PIERRE [FR]) |