Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS54500028 | 13.09.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | CH1369177 | 08.11.1977 | CH7800037 | 06.11.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO7900275 | Global Dossier | 17.05.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH1369177 | 08.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0006948 | Global Dossier | 23.01.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH1369177 | 08.11.1977 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH635743 | 29.04.1983 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH1369177 | 08.11.1977 |