EP0003120 - Process and apparatus for drying chlorinated polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1981/52] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scholz, Manfred Bonnstrasse 10 D-5030 Hürth / DE | 02 /
Kaiser, Karl, Dr. Hubert-Geuer-Strasse 71 D-5040 Brühl / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79100042.5 | 08.01.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782800952 | 11.01.1978 Original published format: DE 2800952 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0003120 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0003120 | Date: | 25.07.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003120 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08F6/00, C08F8/20, F26B7/00, F26B20/00 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
C08F6/008 (EP,US);
B29B13/06 (EP);
B29B13/065 (EP);
B29B9/16 (EP,US);
F26B17/107 (EP,US);
F26B20/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Trocknung von chlorierten Polymeren | English: | Process and apparatus for drying chlorinated polymers | French: | Procédé et dispositif de séchage de polymères chlorés | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/07] | 25.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 22.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.07.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2435927 (HARRY MANNING ALBERT, et al); | [A]FR2328525 (KELLER PEUKERT GMBH [DE]) |