EP0003752 - Process for preparing molecular-sieve-containing grains having good mechanical solidity, the grains manufactured by this process and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kali-Chemie Aktiengesellschaft Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Derleth, Helmut, Dr.rer.nat. Grosse Drakenburger Strasse 79 D-3070 Nienburg / DE | 02 /
Sauer, Günter Prinzenstrasse 51 D-3070 Nienburg / DE | 03 /
Bretz, Karl-Heinz Berliner Ring 202 D-3070 Nienburg / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79100214.0 | 25.01.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782805546 | 10.02.1978 Original published format: DE 2805546 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003752 | Date: | 05.09.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003752 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/28, B01J29/06, B01D15/04, B01J20/16 | [1981/11] | CPC: |
B01J20/186 (EP,US);
B01J20/183 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/11] | C01B33/28, B01J29/06, B01D15/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Molekularsieb enthaltenden Granulaten guter mechanischer Festigkeit, die nach diesem Verfahren hergestellten Granulate und deren Verwendung | English: | Process for preparing molecular-sieve-containing grains having good mechanical solidity, the grains manufactured by this process and their use | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de grains ayant une bonne résistance mécanique et contenant des tamis moléculaires, les grains préparés ainsi et leur utilisation | Examination procedure | 06.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/05] | 18.03.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 11.06.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.09.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DD53052 [ ]; | DE1192164 [ ]; | DE1165562 [ ] (BAYER AG); | GB998262 [ ] (SOCONY MOBIL OIL CO INC); | FR1546121 [ ] (HERRMANN FA GEB); | DE2008444 [ ] (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP); | US3714072 [ ] (MAAT H, et al); | US4022714 [ ] (ELLIOTT JR CURTIS HOMER) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 88, Nr. 4, 23. Januar 1978, Zusammenfassung Nr. 28244y, Columbus, Ohio, USA, EJSYMONT JAN et al.: "Effect of the composition of a binding agent having the character of sodium-calcium and sodium-magnesium glass on the properties of granulated X-type zeolite. Determination of the crushing strength of catalysts", Seite 322, linke Spalte & Zesz. Nauk. Uniw. Jagiellon, Pr. Chem. 1977, 22163-85. * Zusammenfassung * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 88, Nr. 2, 1. September 1978, Zusammenfassung Nr. 12333r, Columbus, Ohio, USA, EJSYMONT JAN et al.: "The formation of zeolite 13X with binding agents composed of sodium-calcium and sodium-magnesium glasses", Seite 333, rechte Spalte & Zesz. Nauk. Uniw. Jagiellon, Pr. Chem. 1976, 21325-39. |