EP0003585 - Stabilised azulmic acids, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Kuno, Dr. Am Kiesberg 8 D-5090 Leverkussen 1 / DE | 02 /
Findeisen, Kurt, Dr. In der Follmühle 10 D-5068 Odenthal 2 / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79100331.2 | 05.02.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782806019 | 14.02.1978 Original published format: DE 2806019 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0003585 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0003585 | Date: | 22.08.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003585 | Date: | 26.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/22, C08G83/00, C01C3/06, B01J21/00, B01J23/00, B01J31/00, B01J45/00, C08K5/34, C07D251/30, C08G18/16 | [1981/34] | CPC: |
C08L79/00 (EP,US);
C08G61/04 (EP,US);
C08G73/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/34] | C08G73/00, C08G61/04, C08G73/06, C08L79/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Stabilisierte Azulminsäuren, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | English: | Stabilised azulmic acids, process for their preparation and their use | French: | Acides azulmiques stabilisés, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation | Examination procedure | 05.02.1979 | Examination requested | 06.11.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 21.02.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.03.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB845363 [ ] (MONSANTO CHEMICALS) |