EP0005432 - Display device for images formed by ultrasonic pulse-echo technique [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchner, Klaus, Ing.grad. Schleifweg 7 a D-8521 Uttenreuth / DE | 02 /
Haerten, Rainer, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Im Heuschlag 25 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79100380.9 | 09.02.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782820660 | 11.05.1978 Original published format: DE 2820660 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005432 | Date: | 28.11.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005432 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/62, G01S15/02, H04N7/00, A61B10/00 | [1982/19] | CPC: |
A61B8/00 (EP,US);
G01S15/8918 (EP,US);
G01S7/52057 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/19] | G01S7/62, G01S9/66, H04N7/00, A61B10/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, NL [1982/19] |
Former [N/P] | CH, DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Nach dem Impuls-Echoverfahren arbeitendes Ultraschall-Bildgerät | English: | Display device for images formed by ultrasonic pulse-echo technique | French: | Appareil de visualisation d'images fonctionnant selon le procédé à échos d'impulsions à ultrasons | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/15] | 29.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2619684 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | US4121250 [ ] (HUELSMAN KENNETH A); | FR2310608 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | US3947826 [ ] (BOCKWOLDT WALTER H); | NL7708143 [ ] (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO) | [ ] - JEE (JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING), No. 132, Dezember 1977, Tokyo (JP) ITO und Andere: "A real time ultrasonic diagnostic system for dynamic and still images: "Wireless Echovision", Seiten 20-26 * Seite 20, Zusammenfassung; Seiten 20, 21 Abschnitt: "principle"; Seiten 22 bis 24ab Abschnitt: "Wireless Echovision" bis Abschnitt: "Display of both dynamic and still images" Abbildungen * |