EP0003812 - Thermo-elastic blend of polyolefines with partially cross-linked ethylene-propylene copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.05.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1984 | Opposition rejected | published on 25.07.1984 [1984/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grigo, Ulrich, Dr. Steinstrasse 161 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Merten, Josef, Dr. An der Blankstrasse 33a D-4052 Korschenbroich 1 / DE | 03 /
Binsack, Rudolf, Dr. Bethelstrasse 4a D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 04 /
Fischer, Winfried, Dr. An der Joch 36 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79100463.3 | 16.02.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782808709 | 01.03.1978 Original published format: DE 2808709 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0003812 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0003812 | Date: | 05.09.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003812 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/02, C08L23/16 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
C08K5/14 (EP);
C08L23/02 (EP);
C08L23/10 (EP);
C08L23/16 (EP);
C08L2312/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/02, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L23/10, C08K5/14, C08L23/10, C08L2312/00 (EP);
C08L23/10, C08K5/14, C08L23/16, C08L2312/00 (EP);
C08L23/16, C08L2666/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Thermoelastische Mischung aus Polyolefinen mit teilvernetzten Ethylen-Propylen-Copolymerisaten | English: | Thermo-elastic blend of polyolefines with partially cross-linked ethylene-propylene copolymers | French: | Mélange élastomère thermoplastique à base de polyoléfines et de copolymères éthylène-propylène partiellement réticulés | Examination procedure | 16.02.1979 | Examination requested | 28.05.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 17.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.09.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.1982
04.02.1983
ADMISSIBLE Naamloze Vennootschap DSM Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL Opponent's representative van de Panne, Vitus Nicolaas Octrooibureau DSM Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.1982
04.02.1983
ADMISSIBLE Naamloze Vennootschap DSM Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL Opponent's representative Van de Panne, Vitus Nicolaas Octrooibureau DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | 04.02.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.05.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 09.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.10.1983 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 17.10.1983 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1984/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2340202 [ ] (UNIROYAL INC); | DE2640850 [ ] (UNIROYAL INC); | [AD]DE2202738 (UNIROYAL INC) |