EP0003841 - Power control circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/46] | Power control circuit for controlling the electrical power supplied to a load | ||
[1985/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY Barley Plaza, Building 17, P.O. Box 80017 Wilmington, DE 19880-0017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chow, Allan Tit-Shing 109 Banbury Drive Windsor Hills Wilmington, Del. 19803 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/46] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79100539.0 | 23.02.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780880945 | 24.02.1978 Original published format: US 880945 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003841 | Date: | 05.09.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003841 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/22, H05B1/02, G05F1/66 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
G05F1/66 (EP,US);
G05D23/1906 (EP,US);
G05D23/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL | Title | German: | Leistungssteuerungsschaltung | [1985/46] | English: | Power control circuit | [1985/46] | French: | Circuit de commande de puissance | [1985/46] |
Former [1985/46] | Leistungssteuerungsschaltung zum Steuern der einer Last zugeführten elektrischen Leistung | ||
Former [1985/46] | Power control circuit for controlling the electrical power supplied to a load | ||
Former [1985/46] | Circuit de commande de puissance pour commander la puissance électrique fournie à une charge | Examination procedure | 05.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/11] | 21.07.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 10.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 28.02.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | FR1348552 [ ]; | US3336531 [ ] (HAYATOSHI YAMADA); | US3440517 [ ] (PAGE ARCHER G, et al); | US3715651 [ ] (OTT E); | US3891931 [ ] (NOUGARET MARCEL, et al); | US4004214 [ ] (EVANS WILLIAM C) |