EP0004549 - Gas discharge display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1980 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiekel, Manfred, Dipl.-Phys. Söflinger Strasse 76 D-7900 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Süssenbach, Helmut, Dipl.-Phys. Schützenweg 28 D-7911 Thalfingen / DE | 03 /
Zimmermann, Harry Eichenweg 6 D-7911 Oberelchingen / DE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Langer, Karl-Heinz Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/02] | Langer, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1980/01] | Langer, Karl-Heinz (DE) Stettenerstrasse 11/1 D-74080 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 79100561.4 | 24.02.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782811976 | 18.03.1978 Original published format: DE 2811976 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0004549 | Date: | 17.10.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/48 | CPC: |
H01J17/492 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Gasentladungsanzeigeschirm | English: | Gas discharge display panel | French: | Panneau d'affichage à décharge dans un gaz | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 23.05.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1980/23] | 01.09.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3739218 [ ]; | US2967965 [ ]; | [A]FR2357056 |