EP0014728 - Hollow dowel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joly, Günter Parkweg 12 D-4930 Detmold-Schanze / DE | [1980/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/18] | Representative(s) | Cohausz, Werner, et al Cohausz Hase Dawidowicz & Partner Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/18] | Cohausz, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Cohausz Hase Dawidowicz & Partner, et al Schumannstrasse 97-99 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 79100563.0 | 26.02.1979 | [1980/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0014728 | Date: | 03.09.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0014728 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/14 | [1980/18] | CPC: |
F16B13/141 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, NL, SE [1980/22] |
Former [1980/18] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Hohler Verpressdübel | [1980/18] | English: | Hollow dowel | [1980/18] | French: | Dispositif d'ancrage creux | [1980/18] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/18] | 27.05.1980 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DE, GB, IT | 07.08.1980 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.02.1980 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 26.02.1980 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 26.02.1980 | IT   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 22.12.1982 | [1983/43] | Documents cited: | Search | DE2641776 [ ]; | FR2353682 [ ]; | DE2410212 [ ]; | DE1259817 [ ]; | DE2541762 [ ]; | GB434438 [ ]; | US4068481 [ ]; | DE2550294 [ ]; | DE1583066 [ ]; | CH449900 [ ]; | DE7734879U [ ]; | AT335922B [ ]; | DE7024434U [ ]; | USB616084I [ ] |