EP0004069 - Process for the preparation of aqueous solutions or dispersions of polyurethanes and their use for the preparation of coatings or lacquers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/31] | Process for the preparation of aqueous solutions or dispersions of polyurethanes, solutions or dispersions obtained by this process and their use for the preparation of coatings or lacquers | ||
[1981/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nachtkamp, Klaus, Dr. Im Odinshof 17 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach / DE | 02 /
Pedain, Josef, Dr. Haferkamp 6 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 03 /
Grammel, Jürgen, Dr. Mörickestrasse 22 D-4047 Dormagen 5 / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79100677.8 | 07.03.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782811148 | 15.03.1978 Original published format: DE 2811148 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0004069 | Date: | 19.09.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004069 | Date: | 05.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/32, C09D3/72, D06M15/52 | [1981/31] | CPC: |
C08G18/283 (EP,US);
C08G18/0804 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3256 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von wässrigen Lösungen oder Dispersionen von Polyurethanen sowie ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung von Überzügen, Lacken oder Beschichtungen | [1981/31] | English: | Process for the preparation of aqueous solutions or dispersions of polyurethanes and their use for the preparation of coatings or lacquers | [1981/31] | French: | Procédé de préparation de solutions ou de dispersions aqueuses de polyuréthanes et leur application pour la préparation de revêtements ou de vernis | [1981/31] |
Former [1981/31] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von wässrigen Lösungen oder Dispersionen von Polyurethanen, die nach diesem Verfahren erhältlichen Lösungen oder Dispersionen, sowie ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung von Überzügen, Lacken oder Beschichtungen | ||
Former [1981/31] | Process for the preparation of aqueous solutions or dispersions of polyurethanes, solutions or dispersions obtained by this process and their use for the preparation of coatings or lacquers | ||
Former [1981/31] | Procédé de préparation de solutions ou de dispersions aqueuses de polyuréthanes, les solutions ou dispersions obtenues par ce procédé et leur application pour la préparation de revêtements ou de vernis | Examination procedure | 07.03.1979 | Examination requested | 17.12.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.01.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.04.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1064841 [ ] (ICI LTD); | EP0000029 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]) |