EP0004333 - Procedure for cooling of electrical components by means of gas and a cooling body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/47] | Cooling body for electrical components | ||
[1981/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Jürgen, Dr. Erlenfeld 29 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Salanki, Tibor, Dr. Kulmbacher Strasse 1 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Scherbaum, Friedrich Rennesstrasse 21 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
Hangs, Werner Eskilstunastrasse 25 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79100745.3 | 12.03.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782812334 | 21.03.1978 Original published format: DE 2812334 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004333 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004333 | Date: | 03.10.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004333 | Date: | 25.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/46 | [1981/47] | CPC: |
H01L23/467 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kühlung elektrischer Bauelemente mittels Gas und Kühlkörper | [1981/47] | English: | Procedure for cooling of electrical components by means of gas and a cooling body | [1981/47] | French: | Procédure de refroidissement des composants électriques au moyen de gas et d'un corps de refroidissement | [1981/47] |
Former [1981/47] | Kühlkörper für elektrische Bauelemente | ||
Former [1981/47] | Cooling body for electrical components | ||
Former [1981/47] | Corps de refroidissement pour composants électriques | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.11.1979 | Examination requested [1980/03] | 17.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.12.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.05.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2909714 [ ] (DIEBOLD EDWARD J); | US3592260 [ ] (BERGER HARVEY L) |