EP0004336 - Sealing device for a housing's opening containing a moving rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martin Merkel KG Sanitasstrasse 17-21 D-2102 Hamburg 93 / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hopp, Helmut Legienstrasse 156 D-2000 Hamburg 74 / DE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Richard, Dr. Ing., et al Liebherrstrasse 20 D-8000 München 26 / DE | [1981/06] | Application number, filing date | 79100763.6 | 14.03.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782813163 | 25.03.1978 Original published format: DE 2813163 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004336 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004336 | Date: | 03.10.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004336 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32, F16J11/02 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
F16J15/3268 (EP);
F16J15/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Dichtungsanordnung für eine bewegte Stange enthaltende Gehäuseöffnung | English: | Sealing device for a housing's opening containing a moving rod | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité de traversée de paroi pour tige mobile | Examination procedure | 07.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/05] | 18.02.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.08.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1008657 [ ] (WALKER & CO JAMES LTD); | GB1385882 [ ] (BAL LTD); | US2295160 [ ] (GEORGE CHRISTENSON); | US3645542 [ ] (ADAMS FREDERICK J) |