Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
10.02.1987 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 25.03.1987 [1987/13] |
11.01.1985 | Opposition filed | published on 13.03.1985 [1985/11] |
11.02.1984 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.04.1984 [1984/15] |
09.10.1981 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.1981 [1981/49] |
03.06.1980 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.08.1980 [1980/16] |
04.09.1979 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |