Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4266961 | 12.05.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | US7936879 | 27.09.1979 | US89821378 | 20.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU528204B | Global Dossier | 21.04.1983 | B2 | AU4587979 | 25.10.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US89821378 | 20.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0004907 | Global Dossier | 25.03.1987 | B2 | EP0004907 | 11.04.1984 | B1 | EP0004907 | 31.10.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89821378 | 20.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR7902428 | 20.11.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US89821378 | 20.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1131451 | 14.09.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US89821378 | 20.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2966883D1 | 17.05.1984 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US89821378 | 20.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES480409 | 16.12.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89821378 | 20.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6259060B | 09.12.1987 | B2 | JPS54139920 | 30.10.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US89821378 | 20.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX152599 | 17.09.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US89821378 | 20.04.1978 |