EP0005197 - Safety device in case of rupturing of a hose between a pressurized conduit and the supply pipe of an apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.1980 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.1980 [1980/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Höffgen, Gerd Altenrather strasse 30 D-5204 Lohmar / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79101127.3 | 12.04.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782817001 | 19.04.1978 Original published format: DE 2817001 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005197 | Date: | 14.11.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08, F16K17/32, F16L35/00, F17D5/02 | CPC: |
D06F39/081 (EP,US);
F16K17/32 (EP);
F16L35/00 (EP);
F16L55/1015 (EP);
G01M3/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB | Title | German: | Schlauchbruchsicherung zwischen einer Druckmittelleitung und einer geräteseitigen Zuführung | English: | Safety device in case of rupturing of a hose between a pressurized conduit and the supply pipe of an apparatus | French: | Dispositif de sécurité en cas de rupture du tuyau, placé entre une conduite sous pression et le raccordement à un appareil | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1980/24] | 21.08.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2507313 [ ] (LIEBHERR MISCHTECHNIK GMBH); | DE2606656 [ ] (KLEIN HARTMUT); | DE2360274 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | DE100633 [ ]; | DE2227212 [ ]; | DE2350093 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | DE2634963 [ ] (KLEIN HARTMUT); | FR1388747 [ ] |