Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.1984 [1984/40] |
23.07.1983 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.09.1983 [1983/38] |
13.05.1980 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.07.1980 [1980/15] |
11.04.1980 | Change - applicant | published on 11.06.1980 [1980/12] |
04.09.1979 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |