Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU527030B | Global Dossier | 10.02.1983 | B2 | AU4569779 | 18.10.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | KR790001163 | 12.04.1979 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0004949 | Global Dossier | 21.09.1983 | B1 | EP0004949 | 31.10.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | KR790001163 | 12.04.1979 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR222390 | 15.05.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR222391 | 15.05.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR224011 | 15.10.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR225045 | 15.02.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR228037 | 14.01.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR231991 | 30.04.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR241488 | 31.07.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT376687B | 27.12.1984 | B | ATA553981 | 15.05.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | AT275079 | 12.04.1979 | AT553981 | 23.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT376688B | 27.12.1984 | B | ATA554081 | 15.05.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | AT554081 | 23.12.1981 | AT275079 | 12.04.1979 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT377767B | 25.04.1985 | B | ATA275079 | 15.09.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG61244B | 31.03.1997 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US18998180 | 23.09.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1142914 | 15.03.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | KR790001163 | 12.04.1979 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK165325C | 29.03.1993 | C | DK165325B | 09.11.1992 | B | DK152579 | 14.10.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK92192D0 | 15.07.1992 | D0 | DK92192 | 15.07.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES479576 | 01.12.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI67389C | 11.03.1985 | C | FI67389B | 30.11.1984 | B | FI791193 | 14.10.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR68531 | 14.01.1982 | B | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK80187 | 06.11.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | KR790001163 | 12.04.1979 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU182529 | 30.01.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | HUME002270 | 11.04.1979 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE48127 | 03.10.1984 | B1 | IE790765L | 13.10.1979 | L | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | KR790001163 | 12.04.1979 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL57050 | 30.09.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0246566B | 16.10.1990 | B2 | JPS63152320 | 24.06.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | KR790001163 | 12.04.1979 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6361315B | 28.11.1988 | B2 | JPS54145669 | 14.11.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | KR790001163 | 12.04.1979 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR830000085B | 08.02.1983 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR790001163 | 12.04.1979 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO153141C | 22.01.1986 | C | NO153141B | 14.10.1985 | B | NO791220L | 16.10.1979 | L | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ190119 | 14.12.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | KR790001163 | 12.04.1979 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL126826B | 30.09.1983 | B1 | PL214881 | 11.12.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL223577 | 27.11.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT69451 | 01.05.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4179453 | 18.12.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4377584 | 22.03.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US2037179 | 15.03.1979 | KR790001163 | 12.04.1979 | US18998180 | 23.09.1980 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | YU86879 | 31.10.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA791752 | 26.11.1980 | B | Priority number | Date | KR790001163 | 12.04.1979 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2966173D1 | 27.10.1983 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US89612078 | 13.04.1978 | US89611878 | 13.04.1978 |