EP0006426 - Vibrations-measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.1980 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERATOM Internationale Atomreaktorbau GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | [1980/14] |
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states INTERATOM Internationale Atomreaktorbau GmbH c/o Siemens AG Postfach 261 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnapp, Herbert Mendener Strasse 26 D-5205 St.Augustin I Mülldorf / DE | [1980/01] | Application number, filing date | 79101192.7 | 19.04.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | DE19782828541 | 29.06.1978 Original published format: DE 2828541 | [1980/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006426 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G01H1/04, G21C17/00 | [1980/01] | CPC: |
G01D11/30 (EP,US);
G01H1/04 (EP,US);
G01V1/16 (EP,US);
G10K11/004 (EP,US);
G21C17/00 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/01] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Schwingungsmessung | [1980/01] | English: | Vibrations-measuring device | [1980/01] | French: | Dispositif pour la mesure de vibrations | [1980/01] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 16.01.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.162(4) [1980/13] | 28.02.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1391176 [ ] (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD); | US3225294 [ ] (MCCLUNG ROBERT W, et al); | CH429202 [ ] (HIRSCHMANN KARLHEINZ [DE]); | US4030202 [ ] (FADL MOHAMED F A, et al) |