|
10.09.1987 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1987 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1987 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1987 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1987 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1987 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1987 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.1987 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.03.1987 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1987 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.11.1986 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.11.1986 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.03.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.1986 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.03.1986 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
06.03.1986 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.01.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.1986 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.1985 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1985 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1985 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.07.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1985 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.07.1985 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.1985 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.1985 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.03.1985 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1985 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1985 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1984 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
23.11.1984 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.1984 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1984 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1984 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1984 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1984 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.1983 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1983 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1983 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.11.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.11.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.11.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.11.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.03.1983 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.1983 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
11.08.1982 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1982 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1982 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.1982 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.1982 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.11.1981 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.1980 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.1979 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1979 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1979 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.1979 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.1979 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.1979 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.04.1979 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.1979 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.1979 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.1979 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.04.1979 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.04.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
26.04.1979 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.04.1979 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |