EP0007973 - Process for the preparation of thienamycin and intermediates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 26.11.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1986 | Opposition rejected | published on 14.01.1987 [1987/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | ||
Former [1980/04] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. (a New Jersey corp.) 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, N.J. 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christensen, Burton Grant 195 Watchung Terrace Scotch Plains, N.J. 07060 / US | 02 /
Salzmann, Thomas Norse 387 Brook Avenue North Plainfield, N.J. 07062 / US | 03 /
Ratcliffe, Ronald William 234 Matawan Avenue Matawan, N.J. 07747 / US | [1980/04] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/04] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101307.1 | 01.05.1979 | [1980/04] | Priority number, date | US19780933323 | 14.08.1978 Original published format: US 933323 | [1980/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007973 | Date: | 20.02.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0007973 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D205/08, // C07F7/10 ,(C07D487/04, 205:00, 209:00) | [1980/04] | CPC: |
C07D477/20 (EP,US);
C07D205/08 (EP,US);
C07D477/04 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Thienamycin und Zwischenprodukten | [1980/04] | English: | Process for the preparation of thienamycin and intermediates | [1980/04] | French: | Procédé de préparation de thiénamycine et des intermédiaires | [1980/04] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1980 | Examination requested [1980/22] | 16.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP82105683.5 / EP0066301 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.10.1984
22.01.1985
ADMISSIBLE Bristol-Myers Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US Opponent's representative Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al, et al Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.10.1984
22.01.1985
ADMISSIBLE Bristol-Myers Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US Opponent's representative Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al, et al Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | 11.02.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.08.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.09.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M03) | 12.12.1985 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 31.07.1986 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 11.08.1986 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1987/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4122086 [ ] (HALL RALPH FLOYD, et al) | [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Vol. 100, No. 1, January 4, 1978, D.B.R. JOHNSTON et al. "Total synthesis of (+)-Thienamycin", pages 313-315. * Complete article * | Examination | EP0017970 | - Houben-Weyl, Methoden der organischen Chemie (1955) Vol. IX pages 103 and 114 |