EP0005558 - Steroid derivatives, process for their preparation and their use in radioimmunoassays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc. Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton, N.J. 08540-4000 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varma, Ravi K. 293 Deer Run Drive Belle Mead, N.J. / US | 02 /
Chao, Sam T. 3 Debbie Lane East Windsor, N.J. / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Volker, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Vossius, Volker, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/04] | Vossius, Volker, Dr., et al Vossius, Vossius, Hiltl, Tauchner Heunemann; Patentanwälte Siebertstrasse 4 P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101578.7 | 22.05.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780908294 | 22.05.1978 Original published format: US 908294 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005558 | Date: | 28.11.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005558 | Date: | 27.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07J1/00, C07J5/00, C07J7/00, C07B23/00, A61K43/00, G01N33/56 | [1982/04] | CPC: |
C07J5/0015 (EP,US);
C07J1/0022 (EP,US);
C07J1/0037 (EP,US);
C07J21/005 (EP,US);
C07J5/0053 (EP,US);
C07J7/002 (EP,US);
G01N33/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1982/04] | C07B23/00, C07J1/00, C07J5/00, C07J7/00, A61K43/00, G01N33/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Steroidderivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Anwendung bei Radioimmunoassays | English: | Steroid derivatives, process for their preparation and their use in radioimmunoassays | French: | Dérivés de stéroides, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation dans des radio-immuno-essais | Examination procedure | 17.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 27.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 02.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.07.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2002385 [ ] (SQUIBB & SONS INC) |