EP0005798 - Stabilized fibre-optical measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1985 [1985/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA AB S-721 83 Västeras / SE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adolfsson, Morgan, Dipl.-Ing. Sigfrid Edströms Gata 87 S-724 66 Västeras / SE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Boecker, Joachim Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | Boecker, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Adelonstrasse 58 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101591.0 | 23.05.1979 | Priority number, date | SE19780006486 | 02.06.1978 Original published format: SE 7806486 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005798 | Date: | 12.12.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005798 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26, G01P15/08, G01H9/00, G08C19/36 | [1984/43] | CPC: |
G01H9/006 (EP,US);
G01D5/268 (EP,US);
G01D5/342 (EP,US);
G01P15/093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Stabilisiertes faseroptisches Messgerät | English: | Stabilized fibre-optical measuring apparatus | French: | Appareil de mesure stabilisé, utilisant des fibres optiques | Examination procedure | 23.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/17] | 03.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1698013 [ ] (ZIMMER KARL F); | US3590259 [ ] (JOHNSTON RUSSEL R, et al); | US3602037 [ ] (NEU FRANKLIN D); | GB1401699 [ ] (DRYCZYNSKI K); | US3919546 [ ] (LUTUS PAUL A); | FR2319120 [ ] (KRYLOV VYACHESLAV [SU]); | DE2620914 [ ] (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | NL7809941 [ ] (HECTRONIC AG); | WO7900180 [ ] (HECTRONIC AG [CH], et al); | FR2405463 [ ] (HECTRONIC AG [CH]); | NL7811205 [ ] (ASEA AB); | FR2410255 [ ] (ASEA AB [SE]); | GB2010476 [ ] (ASEA AB) | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN Band 18, Juli 1975, Nr. 2, New York (US) C.H. FIESTEL: "Self-Calibrating Optical Position Sensor"; Seiten 302-303 * Der ganze Artikel * |