EP0008321 - Vinylchloride bulk polymerisation process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.03.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÜLS TROISDORF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 11 65 D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | [1980/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Büning, Robert, Dr. Lessingstrasse 11 D-5210 Troisdorf-Sieglar / DE | 02 /
Konermann, Hans-Ewald, Dr. Kiefernstrasse 2 D-5210 Troisdorf-Oberlar / DE | [1980/05] | Application number, filing date | 79101614.0 | 28.05.1979 | [1980/05] | Priority number, date | DE19782837173 | 25.08.1978 Original published format: DE 2837173 | [1980/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0008321 | Date: | 05.03.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0008321 | Date: | 19.03.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08F255/02, C08F2/44, // C08F114/06 ,(C08F255/02, 214:06) | [1980/05] | CPC: |
C08F255/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F255/02, C08F214/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Massepolymerisation von Vinylchlorid | [1980/05] | English: | Vinylchloride bulk polymerisation process | [1980/05] | French: | Procédé de polymérisation en masse du chlorure de vinyle | [1980/05] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 08.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1984 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/20] | 28.11.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7728592 ; | [A]US3151103 (JOSEPH HECKMAIER, et al); | [A]FR1535224 (SOLVAY); | [AD]DE2400611 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [D]DE2727234 (HOOKER CHEMICALS PLASTICS CORP); | FR2368502 [ ] (HOOKER CHEMICALS PLASTICS CORP [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 86, Nr. 24, 13-06-1977, Seite 50, Nr. 72531r, Columbus, Ohio, USA. & JP-A-77 28592 (SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.), 03-03-1977., & JP7728592 A 00000000 |