EP0005830 - Cephalosporin derivatives, their preparation and the corresponding pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/38] | Cephalosporin derivatives, corresponding pharmaceutical compositions, the preparation of the cephalosporin derivatives, corresponding starting compounds, and the use of the cephalosporin derivatives for the treatment of diseases | ||
[1982/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CIE 124-184 Grenzacherstrasse CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Montavon, Marc, Dr. Realpstrasse 72 CH-4054 Basel / CH | 02 /
Reiner, Roland, Dr. Rheinfelderstrasse 8 CH-4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/38] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Vanderwerth, Lederer & Riederer Patentanwälte Lucile-Grahn-Strasse 22 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101657.9 | 30.05.1979 | Priority number, date | CH19780005882 | 30.05.1978 Original published format: CH 588278 | CH19790002248 | 08.03.1979 Original published format: CH 224879 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005830 | Date: | 12.12.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005830 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/36, A61K31/545 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
C07D501/36 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Cephalosporinderivate, deren Herstellung und die entsprechenden pharmazeutischen Präparate | [1982/38] | English: | Cephalosporin derivatives, their preparation and the corresponding pharmaceutical compositions | [1982/38] | French: | Dérivés de céphalosporine, leur préparation et les compositions pharmaceutiques correspondants | [1982/38] |
Former [1982/38] | Cephalosporinderivate, entsprechende pharmazeutische Präparate, die Herstellung der Cephalosporinderivate, entsprechende Ausgangsverbindungen sowie die Verwendung der Cephalosporinderivate bei der Behandlung von Krankheiten | ||
Former [1982/38] | Cephalosporin derivatives, corresponding pharmaceutical compositions, the preparation of the cephalosporin derivatives, corresponding starting compounds, and the use of the cephalosporin derivatives for the treatment of diseases | ||
Former [1982/38] | Dérivés de céphalosporine, compositions pharmaceutiques correspondantes, préparation de dérivés de céphalosporine, composés de base correspondants, et utilisation des dérivés de céphalosporine dans le traitement de maladies | Examination procedure | 08.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/15] | 17.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.01.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP81106777.6 / EP0045525 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2534071 (LILLY CO ELI); | [A]DE2713272 (ROUSSEL UCLAF); | [A]DE2715385 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD); | [A]DE2707565 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [A]DE2738712 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) | by applicant | DE2715385 | DE2707565 |