EP0005845 - Method and apparatus for manufacturing magnetic media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bate, Geoffrey Sunshine Canyon Boulder, Colorado 80302 / US | 02 /
Dunn, Larry P. 1423 Ashcroft Drive Longmont Colorado 80501 / US | [1984/03] |
Former [1984/03] | 01 /
Bate, Geoffrey Sunshine Canyon Bouler Colorado 80302 / US | ||
02 /
Dunn, Larry P. 1423 Ashcroft Drive Longmont Colorado 80501 / US | Representative(s) | Hobbs, Francis John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Hobbs, Francis John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1983/36] | Chaudhry, Mohammad Saeed IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester Hants, S021 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 79101696.7 | 01.06.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780912800 | 05.06.1978 Original published format: US 912800 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005845 | Date: | 12.12.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005845 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/84, G11B5/82 | [1984/04] | CPC: |
G11B5/845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Herstellung magnetischer Aufzeichnungsträger | English: | Method and apparatus for manufacturing magnetic media | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication de supports d'enregistrement magnétiques | Examination procedure | 16.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/07] | 02.06.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 18.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 29.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 16.12.1981 | Appeal received No. T0040/82 | 10.02.1982 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.10.1982 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1982/43] | 09.11.1982 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1982/46] | 02.03.1983 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1983/10] | 12.03.1983 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1983/11] | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.01.1984 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | US3627580 [ ] (KRALL HARRY J); | DE2304518 [ ] (ARVIN IND INC); | DE2336228 [ ] (CELANESE CORP); | DE2435096 [ ] (BASF AG); | DE2748215 [ ] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |