EP0009531 - Transducer signal amplifier and transducer bias circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/08] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lewkowicz, Julian 8032 E. Presidio Tucson, Arizona 85715 / US | [1980/08] | Representative(s) | Lewis, Alan John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/08] | Lewis, Alan John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 79101710.6 | 01.06.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | US19780947308 | 29.09.1978 Original published format: US 947308 | [1980/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009531 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009531 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/30, G11B5/47, H03H11/42 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
G11B5/027 (EP,US);
G11B5/03 (EP,US);
G11B5/39 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/08] | G11B5/30, H03H11/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/08] | Title | German: | Signalverstärker eines Wandlers und Schaltungen zur Vorspannungserzeugung für den Wandler | [1980/08] | English: | Transducer signal amplifier and transducer bias circuits | [1980/08] | French: | Amplificateur de signaux d'un transducteur et circuits pour la prémagnétisation du transducteur | [1980/08] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/17] | 30.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3814863 [ ] (O DAY R, et al); | US3860965 [ ] (VOEGELI OTTO); | US4050086 [ ] (HARR JEROME DANFORTH) | Examination | - W.E.-Heinlein, W.Harvey Holmes Active Filters for Integrated Circuits R.Oldenburg Verlag München, Wien 1974 S. 292-295 |