EP0005855 - Closure for jewelry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.1982 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Change - representative | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Redi, Vittorio Localitá La Ripa dell'Olmo Arezzo / IT | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/23] | Langhoff, Walter, Dr. Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101744.5 | 01.06.1979 | Priority number, date | IT19780001222 | 02.06.1978 Original published format: IT 122278 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0005855 | Date: | 12.12.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0005855 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | A44B11/25, A44C11/02, A44C5/20, F16G15/00 | CPC: |
A44B11/2584 (EP);
A44C5/2071 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verschluss für Schmuckstück | English: | Closure for jewelry | French: | Fermoir pour bijouterie | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 13.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/18] | 05.02.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1982/30] | 16.04.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1981 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR527559 [ ] (JOSEPH GUSTAVE SIMONOT [FR], et al); | FR654340 [ ]; | FR716970 [ ] (RELIEF FASTENERS PROPRIETARY L); | FR861411 [ ]; | FR1082106 [ ] (DEVOUCOUX & FILS); | US2893094 [ ] (HECKETHORN JOHN E); | DE1214456 [ ] (PRYM WERKE WILLIAM); | DE1258167 [ ] (AEROQUIP AG); | FR1514012 [ ]; | US3530546 [ ] (FERRANDO JUAN VILARRUBIS) |