EP0006225 - Lifting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1980 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vereinigte Metallwerke Ranshofen-Berndorf AG Wohllebengasse 9 A-1041 Wien IV / AT | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hrachowitz, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Elisenstrasse 35 A-1236 Wien / AT | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Hain, Leonhard Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79101930.0 | 13.06.1979 | Priority number, date | AT19780004319 | 14.06.1978 Original published format: AT 431978 | AT19780004536 | 22.06.1978 Original published format: AT 453678 | AT19780005779 | 09.08.1978 Original published format: AT 577978 | AT19780008552 | 30.11.1978 Original published format: AT 855278 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006225 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/44 | CPC: |
B60P1/4414 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, NL, SE | Title | German: | Hubeinrichtung | English: | Lifting device | French: | Dispositif de levage | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1981/03] | 17.10.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3842997 [ ] (SPRIKKELMAN G); | DE1029739 [ ]; | DE825803 [ ]; | FR2198853 [ ]; | DE2352991 [ ]; | DE2253654 [ ]; | DE2246821 [ ] |