EP0006241 - Cooling device for electrical components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bahlinger, Walter Eduard-Schenkstrasse 68 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79102012.6 | 18.06.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782826898 | 19.06.1978 Original published format: DE 2826898 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006241 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006241 | Date: | 23.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/46, H05K7/20 | [1981/51] | CPC: |
H01L23/473 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, SE [1981/51] |
Former [N/P] | DE, FR, GB, SE | Title | German: | Kühlkörper für elektrische Bauelemente | English: | Cooling device for electrical components | French: | Corps de refroidissement pour éléments électriques | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/18] | 15.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2378250 [ ]; | DE2160302 [ ]; | DE2814809 [ ] |