EP0007439 - Sulphamic acid halides and method for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/03] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamprecht, Gerhard, Dr. Rote-Turm-Strasse 28 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Parg, Adolf, Dr. Paray-Le-Monial-Strasse 8 D-6702 Bad Duerkheim 5 / DE | 03 /
Koenig, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Pierstrasse 8 a D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | [1980/03] | Application number, filing date | 79102054.8 | 21.06.1979 | [1980/03] | Priority number, date | DE19782828969 | 01.07.1978 Original published format: DE 2828969 | DE19792911456 | 23.03.1979 Original published format: DE 2911456 | [1980/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007439 | Date: | 06.02.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0007439 | Date: | 28.07.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07C143/86, // A01N47/34 | [1982/30] | CPC: |
C07C311/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/03] | C07C143/86, // A01N47/24 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/03] | Title | German: | Neue Sulfamidsäurehalogenide und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Sulfamidsäurehalogeniden | [1980/03] | English: | Sulphamic acid halides and method for their preparation | [1980/03] | French: | Halogénures d'acide sulfamique et procédé pour leur préparation | [1980/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/20] | 04.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.12.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR735765 [ ]; | DE1943234 [ ] (BAYER AG); | DE1953356 [ ] (BAYER AG); | DE2408530 [ ] (BASF AG); | DE2634485 [ ] (BASF AG) | [ ] - JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH, Miniprint, Heft 10, Oktober 1977, Whitstable, Kent, Great Britain D. BARTHOLOMEW et al. "Synthesis of 2-Alkyl-2-chloro- and fluorosul-phonylcarbamoyl chlorides and their reaction with some simple nucleophiles" Seiten 2801 bis 2809. |