EP0007035 - A process for increasing the molecular weight of chlorinated polyethylene and/or chlorinated ethylene-vinylacetate-copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/02] | A process to increase the molecular weight of chlorinated elastomers, and products obtained | ||
[1981/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/02] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Manfred, Dr. Auf dem Krahwinkel 5 D-5074 Odenthal-Hahnenberg / DE | 02 /
Göbel, Wilhelm, Dr. Max-Beckmann-Strasse 37 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1980/02] | Application number, filing date | 79102130.6 | 27.06.1979 | [1980/02] | Priority number, date | DE19782830556 | 12.07.1978 Original published format: DE 2830556 | [1980/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007035 | Date: | 23.01.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0007035 | Date: | 23.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/20, C08F8/34, C08F10/02 | [1981/51] | CPC: |
C08F8/20 (EP,US);
C08L23/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/02] | C08F8/20, C08F8/34 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung des Molgewichtes von chloriertem Polyethylen und/oder chloriertem Ethylen-Vinylacetat-copolymerisat | [1981/51] | English: | A process for increasing the molecular weight of chlorinated polyethylene and/or chlorinated ethylene-vinylacetate-copolymer | [1981/51] | French: | Procédé pour augmenter le poids moléculaire de polyéthylène chloré et/ou de copolymère éthylene-acetate de vinyle chloré | [1981/51] |
Former [1980/02] | Verfahren zur Erhöhung des Molgewichtes von chlorhaltigen Elastomeren und erhaltene Produkte | ||
Former [1980/02] | A process to increase the molecular weight of chlorinated elastomers, and products obtained | ||
Former [1980/02] | Procédé pour augmenter le poids moléculaire d'élastomères chlorés et produits obtenus | Examination procedure | 27.06.1979 | Examination requested [1980/02] | 08.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 04.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1811472 [ ] (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | FR1566415 [ ] |