EP0006621 - A sliding swing bearing for bridges and similar structures comprising top, centre and base plate, and method for lining the curved upper surface of the base plate of such bearings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.04.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1986 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.05.1986 [1986/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLACIER GMBH - DEVA WERKE Schulstrasse 20 35260 Stadtallendorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states GLACIER GMBH - DEVA WERKE Schulstrasse 20 D-35260 Stadtallendorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greb, Gerhard Am Schellenberg 12 D-6315 Mücke 2 / DE | 02 /
Baigent, Maurice G. The Hatches Hare Lane Broadway Ilminster/Somerset / GB | [1980/01] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Werner, et al Patentanwälte GEYER, HAGEMANN & PARTNER Postfach 860329 Ismaninger Strasse 108 D-8000 München 86 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | Geyer, Werner, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte GEYER, HAGEMANN & PARTNER Postfach 860329 Ismaninger Strasse 108 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79102161.1 | 28.06.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | DE19782829309 | 04.07.1978 Original published format: DE 2829309 | [1980/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006621 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006621 | Date: | 12.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0006621 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | E01D19/04, E04B1/36 | [1980/01] | CPC: |
E01D19/046 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49641 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/01] | Title | German: | Kippgleitlager für Brücken oder ähnliche Bauwerke, mit Ober-, Zwischen- und Unterplatte, und Verfahren zum Auskleiden der gekrümmten Oberseite der Unterplatte solcher Kippgleitlager | [1980/01] | English: | A sliding swing bearing for bridges and similar structures comprising top, centre and base plate, and method for lining the curved upper surface of the base plate of such bearings | [1980/01] | French: | Appui oscillant et à glissement pour ponts et ouvrages d'art analogues comprenant une plaque supérieure, une plaque intermédiaire et une plaque inférieure et procédé pour revêtir la surface courbée de la plaque inférieure de ces appuis | [1980/01] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/13] | 31.07.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.02.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.1981
01.03.1982
ADMISSIBLE MAN Aktiengesellschaft Ungererstrasse 69 Postfach 40 13 47 D-80713 München / DE | [1982/10] | 21.06.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.10.1982 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.10.1982 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 11.11.1982 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 21.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.11.1985 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.03.1986 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH421167 [ ] (AMPEP IND PRODUCTS LIMITED [GB]); | DE1261153 [ ] (OSKAR VOELTER DIPL ING); | DE6911543U [ ] (DEMAG AG [DE]); | DE1959964 [ ] (P S C EQUIPMENT LTD); | DE1658626 [ ]; | DE7820069U [ ] | [ ] - STRASSE BRUCKE TUNNEL, 27. Jahrgang, Heft 11, 1975, Berlin V. HAKENJOS et al. "Dauergleitreibungsverhalten der Gleitpaarung PTFE weiss/Austenitischer Stahl fur Auflager im Bruckenbau". * Seiten 294 bis 297 * |