EP0006623 - Ultrasonic transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.1984 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.1984 [1984/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borburgh, Jacobus, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Eichenstrasse 10 D-8521 Poxdorf / DE | 02 /
Feigt, Ingmar, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Strümpellstrasse 22 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1980/01] | Application number, filing date | 79102163.7 | 28.06.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | DE19782829570 | 05.07.1978 Original published format: DE 2829570 | [1980/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0006623 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0006623 | Date: | 20.08.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006623 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/34, H04R1/10 | [1980/01] | CPC: |
B06B1/0688 (EP,US);
A61B8/4494 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, NL [1980/01] | Title | German: | Ultraschallkopf | [1980/01] | English: | Ultrasonic transducer | [1980/01] | French: | Transducteur ultrasonique | [1980/01] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 05.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2589135 [ ] (RAFUSE IRAD S); | DE732890 [ ] (ELECTROACUSTIC GMBH); | DE2521463 [ ] (RAYTHEON CO); | DE2829581 [ ] (SIEMENS AG) |