EP0008419 - Process for the preparation of alkyde resins containing epsiloncaprolactam residues, the obtained resins and their use as water-dilutable binding agents for paints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/05] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Traenckner, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Wedelstrasse 46 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Schoeps, Jochen, Dr. Windmühlenstrasse 126 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 03 /
Küchenmeister, Rolf, Dr. Drei-Königenstrasse 119 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
Kuhnert, Hans-Ulrich Hauptstrasse 4 D-3141 Westergellersen / DE | [1980/05] | Application number, filing date | 79102896.2 | 10.08.1979 | [1980/05] | Priority number, date | DE19782836611 | 22.08.1978 Original published format: DE 2836611 | [1980/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0008419 | Date: | 05.03.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0008419 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/48, C09D3/64 | [1980/05] | CPC: |
C08G63/48 (EP);
C09D167/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/35] |
Former [1980/05] | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkydharzen, die Epsilon-Caprolactamreste enthalten; die erhaltenen Harze und ihre Verwendung als wasserverdünnbare Bindemittel für Malerlacke | [1980/05] | English: | Process for the preparation of alkyde resins containing epsiloncaprolactam residues, the obtained resins and their use as water-dilutable binding agents for paints | [1980/05] | French: | Procédé de préparation de résines alkydes qui contiennent des restes d'epsilon caprolactame; les résines obtenues et leur application comme liants diluables à l'eau pour des peintures | [1980/05] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1979 | Examination requested [1980/05] | 23.06.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 15.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.12.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1327928 [ ] (SNYDER EDITH L) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 85, Nr. 22, 29. November 1976, Zusammenfassung 161974r, Seite 102. Columbus, Ohio, USA SCHOEPS JOCHEN "E-Caprolactam as a reactive thinner in water-dilytable enamels", & Zentralber. Forsch., Bayer A.G., Krefeld-Uerdingen, Ger., Fatipec Congr. 1976, 13, 57-62. | Examination | US2009432 | DE914066 | - Chem. Zentralblatt (1965). no. 44-2576. |