EP0009671 - Starting compounds for preparing cephem compounds and processes for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/08] | Starting compounds for preparing cephem compounds, processes for their preparation, processes for preparing cephem compounds and cephems so obtained | ||
[1984/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1985 [1985/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 3, Doshomachi 4-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 3, Doshomachi 4-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1980/08] | For all designated states Fujisawa Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 3,4-chome Doshomachi Higashi-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Ikuo No. 4-13-36, Kumano-cho Toyonaka / JP | 02 /
Takaya, Takao No. 1-5-87, Suimeidai Kawanishi / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Masakazu No. 1-5-2, Hachitsuka Ikeda / JP | 04 /
Masugi, Takashi No. 3-17-15, Kitamachi Hotarugaike Toyonaka / JP | 05 /
Takasugi, Hisashi No. 2-12-7, Kohamanishi Suminoe-ku Osaka / JP | 06 /
Kochi, Hiromi No. 1661-3, Kanaoka-cho Sakai / JP | 07 /
Kitaguchi, Tadashi No. 1-9-9, Kukuchinishimachi Amagasaki / JP | [1980/08] | Representative(s) | Türk, Dietmar, et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1980/08] | Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat. Redies, Redies, Türk & Gille Bruckner Strasse 20 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79103389.7 | 11.09.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | JP19780112555 | 12.09.1978 Original published format: JP 11255578 | JP19790003106 | 12.01.1979 Original published format: JP 310679 | GB19360056478 | 12.09.1978 Original published format: GB 3656478 | GB19790005791 | 19.02.1979 Original published format: GB 7905791 | [1980/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0009671 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0009671 | Date: | 25.06.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009671 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D317/30, C07D319/06, C07C131/00, C07D501/00, C07D501/59, // A61K31/545 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
C07D317/30 (EP,US);
C07D319/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/08] | C07D317/30, C07C131/00, C07D501/00, C07D501/59, // A61K31/545 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/08] | Title | German: | Ausgangsprodukte für die Herstellung von Cephem-Verbindungen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1984/24] | English: | Starting compounds for preparing cephem compounds and processes for their preparation | [1984/24] | French: | Produits de départ pour la préparation de composés du type céphem et procédé pour leur préparation | [1984/24] |
Former [1980/08] | Ausgangsprodukte für die Herstellung von Cephem-Verbindungen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, Verfahren zur Herstellung von Cephem-Verbindungen und so erhaltene Cephems | ||
Former [1980/08] | Starting compounds for preparing cephem compounds, processes for their preparation, processes for preparing cephem compounds and cephems so obtained | ||
Former [1980/08] | Produits de départ pour la préparation de composés du type céphem, procédé pour leur préparation, procédé de préparation de composés du type céphem et produits ainsi obtenus | Examination procedure | 06.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/07] | 14.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP81109663.5 / EP0048504 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2296423 [ ] (BRISTOL MYERS CANADA LTD [CA]); | GB1399088 [ ] (GLAXO LAB LTD) |