EP0009218 - Method of and device for depositing travelling filamentary or fibre strands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1984 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.1984 [1984/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vepa AG Bettingerstrasse 32 CH-4125 Riehen/Basel / CH | [1980/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurzke, Herbert, Dr. Karwendelstrasse 4 D-8903 Bobingen / DE | [1980/07] | Application number, filing date | 79103443.2 | 14.09.1979 | [1980/07] | Priority number, date | DE19782840664 | 19.09.1978 Original published format: DE 2840664 | DE19782845881 | 21.10.1978 Original published format: DE 2845881 | [1980/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009218 | Date: | 02.04.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009218 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/76, D01D7/00 | [1980/07] | CPC: |
B65H54/76 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT [1980/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ablegen von laufenden Filament- oder Faserkabeln | [1980/07] | English: | Method of and device for depositing travelling filamentary or fibre strands | [1980/07] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour déposer des câbles de filaments ou de fibres en mouvement | [1980/07] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 11.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]DE1109128 ; | [A]US2636250 (MARTIN HEMMI HANS); | US3256134 [ ] (RICE CHARLES M); | [AD]DE2261366 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF); | DE2420333 [ ] (VEPA AG); | DE2609615 [ ] (TOYO BOSEKI); | [AD]DE2655733 (HOECHST AG); | [AD]DE2704866 (VEPA AG) |