EP0009689 - Process for preparing a crystalline vinylidene chloride polymer powder, and compositions comprising it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/08] | Process for preparing a crystalline vinylidene chloride polymer powder, and compositions conmprising it | ||
[1982/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | ||
Former [1980/08] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Abbott Road Post Office Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gibbs, Dale Sabin 2607 Mt. Vernon Midland Michigan / US | 02 /
Benson, Jack Howard 2813 Blairmont Midland Michigan / US | 03 /
Fernandez, Reet T. 5614 Evergreen Midland Michigan / US | [1980/08] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Patentanwälte Weickmann, Fincke Weickmann, Huber, Liska Möhlstrasse 22 D-8000 München 86 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/08] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Weickmann Dipl.-Phys.Dr. K. Fincke Dipl.-Ing. F.A. Weickmann Dipl.-Chem. B. Huber Dr.-Ing. H. Liska M hlstrasse 22 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79103447.3 | 14.09.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | US19780942514 | 15.09.1978 Original published format: US 942514 | [1980/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009689 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009689 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08F14/08, C08F2/22, C08J3/08 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
C08J9/0061 (EP);
C08F214/08 (EP);
C08J3/11 (EP);
C08J2327/08 (EP);
C08J2375/04 (EP);
C08J2427/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/08] | C08F214/08, C08F2/22, C08J3/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines kristallinen Vinylidenchlorid-Polymerisat-Pulvers und dieses enthaltende Zusammensetzungen | [1982/32] | English: | Process for preparing a crystalline vinylidene chloride polymer powder, and compositions comprising it | [1982/32] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une poudre cristalline de polymère de chlorure de vinylidène, et compositions la contenant | [1980/08] |
Former [1980/08] | Verfahren zur Herstellung kristallinischen Vinylidenchlorid-Polymerisat-Pulvers und dieses enthaltende Zusammensetzungen | ||
Former [1980/08] | Process for preparing a crystalline vinylidene chloride polymer powder, and compositions conmprising it | Examination procedure | 31.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/22] | 05.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.02.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP49033113B [ ]; | [A]US3057752 (COVINGTON EDWARD R [US], et al); | GB1025914 [ ] (PITTSBURGH PLATE GLASS CO); | FR93606E [ ] (ICI LTD [AU], et al); | [A]FR2040326 (STALEY MFG CO A E) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 82, No. 16, April 21, 1975, page 142, ref. 100242s Columbus, Ohio, US & JP-B-49 033113 (ASAHI DOW LTD.) 04-09-1974, & JP49033113B B 00000000 | Examination | FR1478438 |